Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 644 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14050 Week
» 67066 Month
» 186593 Year
» 3213446 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
291 |
m/e |
04/1907 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5291 |
m/e |
05/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4406 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
64406 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
J11 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 04/1907 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 23/09/1962 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 5 mths , 23 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
04/1907 |
38A |
|
Colwick |
m/e |
31/12/1950 |
38B |
|
Annesley |
w/e |
27/10/1951 |
36B |
|
Mexborough |
4w/e |
18/05/1957 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
23/09/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
38A |
Colwick |
m/e |
31/12/1950 |
ALLOC |
38B |
Annesley |
w/e |
27/10/1951 |
ALLOC |
36B |
Mexborough |
4w/e |
18/05/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
23/09/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1935 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1907 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 291 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number |
|
|
05/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5291 |
|
|
04/1935 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4406 |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64406 |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
27/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (38B) |
|
|
18/05/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) |
|
|
23/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64406 |
|
|