Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 685 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14091 Week
» 67107 Month
» 186634 Year
» 3213487 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
303 |
m/e |
08/1907 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5303 |
m/e |
09/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4418 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
64418 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
J11 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 08/1907 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 25/11/1961 |
Service Life |
54 yrs, 3 mths , 25 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
01/1931 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
21/02/1959 |
Woodford Halse MPD |
On 21st February J11s 64331/418/28 were exchanged for MR 3Fs 43330/89/94 and these are employed on 'trip' work. |
SLS/195904 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1907 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 303 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number |
|
|
09/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5303 |
|
|
01/1931 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4418 |
|
|
08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64418 |
|
|
29/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) |
|
|
20/06/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) |
|
|
14/02/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (9G) |
|
|
25/11/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64418 |
|
|