Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 619 Today
» 1293 Yesterday
» 6826 Week
» 4339 Month
» 232223 Year
» 1453788 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 305 m/e 09/1907
LNER (1924) 5305 m/e 03/1925
LNER (1946) 4420 m/e 11/1946
BR 64420 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/209/1907
J11/107/1927
J11/212/1939
J11/505/1942
J11/305/1949
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 09/1907
Withdrawal w/e Sat 09/06/1962
Service Life 54 yrs, 9 mths , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1907
38A Colwick 4w/e 18/10/1952
38B Annesley 4w/e 18/05/1957
9G Gorton w/e 07/05/1960
   Withdrawn w/e 09/06/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 38B Annesley 4w/e 18/05/1957
LOAN 16D Annesley 01/02/1958
ALLOC 16D Annesley 23/02/1958
ALLOC 9G Gorton 5w/e 30/04/1960
WDN   w/e 09/06/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1942 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1907 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 305
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
   
03/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 5305    
05/1942 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4420    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 64420    
18/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
18/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
07/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
09/06/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 64420    

prev prev