Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1225 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14631 Week
» 67647 Month
» 187174 Year
» 3214027 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
311 |
m/e |
11/1907 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5311 |
m/e |
12/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4425 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
64425 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
J11 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 11/1907 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 08/11/1960 |
Service Life |
53 yrs , 8 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1907 |
BRN |
|
Barnsley |
w/e |
03/12/1949 |
41F |
|
Mexborough |
w/e |
09/01/1960 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
08/11/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
BRN |
Barnsley |
w/e |
03/12/1949 |
ALLOC |
41F |
Mexborough |
4w/e |
23/01/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
08/11/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1939 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1907 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 311 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number |
|
|
12/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5311 |
|
|
08/1939 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4425 |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64425 |
|
|
03/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN) |
|
|
09/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) |
|
|
08/11/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64425 |
|
|