Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 917 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 3056 Week
» 13226 Month
» 291022 Year
» 1175403 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 316 m/e 12/1907
LNER (1924) 5316 m/e 02/1925
LNER (1946) 4430 m/e 08/1946
BR 64430 m/e 02/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/212/1907
J11/104/1926
J11/411/1933
J11/501/1956
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 12/1907
Withdrawal Thu 21/05/1959
Service Life 51 yrs, 5 mths , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
36C Frodingham 4w/e 08/01/1958
40A Lincoln 4w/e 08/02/1958
   Withdrawn 21/05/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1915 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 64430    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Lincoln (LIN)    
08/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
08/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
21/05/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 64430    

prev prev