Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 466 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 466 Week
» 17802 Month
» 295598 Year
» 1179979 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 317 m/e 12/1907
LNER (1924) 5317 m/e 07/1925
LNER (1946) 4431 m/e 06/1946
BR 64431 m/e 09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/212/1907
J11/506/1930
J11/402/1942
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 12/1907
Withdrawal Wed 24/10/1956
Service Life 48 yrs, 10 mths , 24 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
38E Woodford Halse 4w/e 20/08/1955
   Withdrawn 24/10/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1925 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 64431    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Annesley (ANN)    
15/08/1954 Sightings Gorton Works visit: Around the works. RO 9/1954 Link
20/08/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E)    
24/10/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 64431    

prev prev