Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 4201 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17607 Week
» 70623 Month
» 190150 Year
» 3217003 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
329 |
m/e |
10/1908 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5329 |
m/e |
06/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4442 |
m/e |
02/1946 |
British Railways |
64442 |
m/e |
08/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
J11 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 10/1908 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 23/09/1962 |
Service Life |
53 yrs, 11 mths , 24 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1908 |
36D |
|
Barnsley |
4w/e |
20/03/1954 |
41F |
|
Mexborough |
w/e |
09/01/1960 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
23/09/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
36D |
Barnsley |
5w/e |
27/03/1954 |
ALLOC |
41F |
Mexborough |
4w/e |
23/01/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
23/09/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
10/1920 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
08/1923 |
Saturated Boiler Fitted |
05/1937 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1908 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 329 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number |
|
|
10/1920 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
08/1923 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated Boiler Fitted |
|
|
06/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5329 |
|
|
05/1937 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
02/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4442 |
|
|
08/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64442 |
|
|
20/03/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barnsley (36D) |
|
|
09/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) |
|
|
23/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64442 |
|
|