Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 2860 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16266 Week
» 69282 Month
» 188809 Year
» 3215662 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
952 |
m/e |
04/1910 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5952 |
m/e |
12/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4450 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
64450 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Robinson |
Class |
J11 |
Company History |
GCR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 04/1910 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 06/04/1962 |
Service Life |
52 yrs , 6 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1924 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
04/1933 |
Saturated Boiler Fitted |
04/1937 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1910 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 952 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number |
|
|
12/1924 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
12/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5952 |
|
|
04/1933 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated Boiler Fitted |
|
|
04/1937 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4450 |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64450 |
|
|
05/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) |
|
|
08/02/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tuxford (40D) |
|
|
20/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (9G) |
|
|
24/01/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tuxford (41K) |
|
|
07/02/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) |
|
|
28/02/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |
|
|
06/04/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64450 |
|
|