Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 139 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 139 Week
» 17475 Month
» 295271 Year
» 1179652 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 952 m/e 04/1910
LNER (1924) 5952 m/e 12/1924
LNER (1946) 4450 m/e 08/1946
BR 64450 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/204/1910
J11/112/1929
J11/405/1942
J11/305/1946
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 04/1910
Withdrawal Fri 06/04/1962
Service Life 52 yrs , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
40D Tuxford 4w/e 08/02/1958
9G Gorton w/e 20/12/1958
41K Tuxford w/e 24/01/1959
41J Langwith Junction w/e 07/02/1959
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) w/e 28/02/1959
   Withdrawn 06/04/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1924 Superheated boiler fitted
04/1933 Saturated boiler fitted
04/1937 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 64450    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Langwith Junction (LNG)    
30/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
08/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Tuxford (40D)    
20/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
24/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tuxford (41K)    
07/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
28/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
06/04/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 64450    

prev prev