Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2031 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15437 Week
» 68453 Month
» 187980 Year
» 3214833 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway (1st) |
850 |
m/e |
10/1889 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7850 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5369 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
65369 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J15 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
R23 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 10/1889 |
Withdrawal |
During 02/1951 |
Service Life |
61 yrs, 4 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1951 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
STR |
Stratford |
w/e |
09/07/1949 |
ALLOC |
COL |
Colchester |
w/e |
19/11/1949 |
WDN |
30E |
Colchester |
on |
05/02/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1889 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 850 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7850 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5369 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 65369 but not taken up |
|
|
07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (STR) |
|
|
09/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (STR) |
|
|
19/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (COL) |
|
|
30/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (COL) |
|
|
02/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5369 |
|
|
04/1951 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|