Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2633 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16039 Week
» 69055 Month
» 188582 Year
» 3215435 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway (1st) |
883 |
m/e |
09/1890 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7883 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5388 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
65388 |
m/e |
02/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J15 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
U25 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 09/1890 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 22/05/1959 |
Service Life |
68 yrs, 8 mths , 21 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
by 12/1939 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 32 Boiler Fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1890 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 883 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7883 |
|
|
12/1939 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 32 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5388 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
02/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65388 |
|
|
25/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
22/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
20/09/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
04/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
08/03/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
22/05/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65388 |
|
|