Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 189 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 189 Week
» 18971 Month
» 267264 Year
» 1151645 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER (1st) 888 m/e 10/1890
LNER (1924) 7888 y/e 1924
LNER (1946) 5391 m/e 10/1946
BR 65391 m/e 03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class J15
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number Y25
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 10/1890
Withdrawal Mon 01/12/1958
Scrapping During 11/1935
Service Life 68 yrs, 2 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CAM Cambridge 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31E Bury St Edmunds 5w/e 23/08/1952
31A Cambridge 4w/e 15/11/1952
31E Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 24/10/1953
   Withdrawn 01/12/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1932 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1890 To Service To service as GER Number 888
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7888    
06/1932 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5391    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
03/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 65391    
23/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E)    
15/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E)    
12/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 65391    

prev prev