Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 219 Today
» 1253 Yesterday
» 7679 Week
» 5192 Month
» 233076 Year
» 1454641 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER (1st) 888 m/e 10/1890
LNER (1924) 7888 y/e 1924
LNER (1946) 5391 m/e 10/1946
BR 65391 m/e 03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class J15
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number Y25
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service During 10/1890
Withdrawal Mon 01/12/1958
Scrapping During 11/1935
Service Life 68 yrs, 2 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1890
CAM Cambridge 01/01/1948
31E Bury St Edmunds 5w/e 23/08/1952
31A Cambridge 4w/e 15/11/1952
31E Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 24/10/1953
   Withdrawn 01/12/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster m/e 28/02/1946
ALLOC 31E Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 06/09/1952
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 31E Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 31/10/1953
WDN   01/12/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1932 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/02/1948 Stratford Works The following locomotives were seen stripped: Nos. *1518, 2620, 4766, 5391, *7118, *7122, *7148, 7203/18, an 9659, while in the process of being stripped were: Nos. 1623/39/52, 5522, an 8529. The following were in course of erection: Nos. 1046/7, 1609/10/21/31/53/59/61/2/3/6 an 8764; No. 4889 was complete, and No. 1553 was apparently in for examination. Awaiting Works at various points were: Nos. 1509/*44/78, 1624, 2536/63, 2590, 2602, 4663/89, *5360/*80/3, 5400/10/18/52, 5506, *7119/*20. *7130/*1/*2/*5/*6/*7/*44/*7/83, 7219/26/37, *7511/*2, 8168/74, 8213, 8372, *8485/*8/9, 8791/6, 8854 an 9604. *Officially withdrawn. The Paint Shop produced the following all newly painted, lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' in yellow paint and prefixed 'E': Nos. 1056, 4687, 5565, an 8376. No. 8082 was stored here. The first locomotive to have been lettered in the above new style was No. 8619, which in addition was painted green and is now to be seen at Liverpool Street, acting as station pilot. The Running Shed produced the following additional locomotives painted in the new style: Nos. 1045, 1664, an 1667 SLS/194803
12/08/1950 Colchester Station Quite an old-world touch was given at Colchester on Saturday, 12th August, in the morning, when an up Clacton-Cambridge train arrived behind two J15's, both of 31A. These were 65477 an 65391 (the latter with a tender-cab). Shortly afterwards, 65391 ran light from the station into Colchester Shed. SLS/195010
12/08/1957 Bury St. Edmunds No transfers are now being recorded between Cambridge (31A) and Bury (31E). Its sub-depot, Sudbury, is supplied by 31A. The present allocation of Bury is 61546/53/4/67/73/6, 62543, 65391, 68497, 69616/20. SLS/195709
02/08/1958 Watlington branch Watlington branch goods services during week ending 2nd August were being worked by M.R. 2F 58131 (14A) whilst J15's 65391/405 were away u/r. SLS/195809

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1890 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 888
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7888    
06/1932 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5391    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
03/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 65391    
23/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E)    
15/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E)    
01/12/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 65391    

prev prev