Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 321 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18124 Week
» 71140 Month
» 190667 Year
» 3217520 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway (1st) |
897 |
m/e |
09/1891 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7897 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5396 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
65396 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J15 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
L28 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 09/1891 |
Withdrawal |
During 03/1951 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 5 mths , 28 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1949 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
w/e |
14/01/1950 |
ALLOC |
IPS |
Ipswich |
w/e |
21/01/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
26/03/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1891 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 897 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7897 |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5396 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kings Lynn (KL) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 65396 but not taken up |
|
|
10/1949 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
14/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
21/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) |
|
|
03/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5396 |
|
|