Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 529 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2436 Week
» 21218 Month
» 269511 Year
» 1153892 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER (1st) 911 m/e 11/1891
LNER (1924) 7911 y/e 1924
LNER (1946) 5405 m/e 12/1946
BR 65405 m/e 02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class J15
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number N28
Brakes (when built) Steam Brake
To Service During 11/1891
Withdrawal Sat 16/08/1958
Scrapping During 11/1938
Service Life 66 yrs, 9 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CAM Cambridge 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31E Bury St Edmunds 5w/e 23/08/1952
31A Cambridge 4w/e 15/11/1952
31E Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 24/10/1953
34E Neasden 5w/e 20/07/1957
   Withdrawn 16/08/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1932 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1891 To Service To service as GER Number 911
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7911    
04/1932 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5405    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 65405    
23/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E)    
15/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E)    
20/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (34E)    
16/08/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 65405    

prev prev