Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 3752 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17158 Week
» 70174 Month
» 189701 Year
» 3216554 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway (1st) |
928 |
m/e |
12/1891 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7928 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5417 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
65417 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J15 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
S28 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 12/1891 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 20/08/1956 |
Service Life |
64 yrs, 8 mths , 21 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1948 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1891 |
NOR |
|
Norwich Thorpe |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
MEL |
|
|
w/e |
17/01/1948 |
NOR |
|
Norwich Thorpe |
w/e |
27/03/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
20/08/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1891 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 928 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7928 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5417 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
17/01/1948 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
03/1948 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
27/03/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65417 |
|
|
20/08/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65417 |
|
|