Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 34 Online
» 2410 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15816 Week
» 68832 Month
» 188359 Year
» 3215212 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway (1st) |
941 |
m/e |
08/1892 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7941 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5424 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
65424 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J15 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
X28 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 08/1892 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 18/12/1959 |
Service Life |
67 yrs, 4 mths , 17 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1960 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1892 |
COL |
|
Colchester |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
30A |
|
Stratford |
w/e |
12/12/1959 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
18/12/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
18/12/1959 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
26/12/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
by 05/1933 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1892 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 941 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7941 |
|
|
05/1933 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5424 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Colchester (COL) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65424 |
|
|
12/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
18/12/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65424 |
|
|
01/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|