Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 530 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18333 Week
» 71349 Month
» 190876 Year
» 3217729 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway (1st) |
517 |
m/e |
06/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7517 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5436 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
65436 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J15 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
S45 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 06/1899 |
Withdrawal |
During 12/1949 off Stratford (STR) |
Service Life |
50 yrs, 5 mths , 30 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1949 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
COL |
Colchester |
w/e |
07/02/1948 |
ALLOC |
STR |
Stratford |
w/e |
22/05/1948 |
WDN |
STR |
Stratford |
on |
12/12/1949 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 517 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7517 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5436 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
07/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (COL) |
|
|
22/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (STR) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 65436 but not taken up |
|
|
12/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5436 from Stratford (STR) |
|
|
12/1949 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|