Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 379 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6355 Week
» 12489 Month
» 240373 Year
» 1461938 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER (1st) 523 m/e 09/1899
LNER (1924) 7523 y/e 1924
LNER (1946) 5438 m/e 10/1946
BR 65438 m/e 07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class J15
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number S45
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service During 09/1899
Withdrawal Sat 19/07/1958
Scrapping During 12/1958
Service Life 58 yrs, 10 mths , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1899
CAM Cambridge 01/01/1948
31E Bury St Edmunds 5w/e 23/08/1952
31A Cambridge 4w/e 15/11/1952
   Withdrawn 19/07/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31E Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 06/09/1952
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 01/11/1952
WDN   16/06/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1934 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1899 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 523
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7523    
07/1934 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5438    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 65438    
23/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E)    
15/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
19/07/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 65438    

prev prev