Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 836 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18639 Week
» 71655 Month
» 191182 Year
» 3218035 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway (1st) |
640 |
m/e |
07/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7640 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5440 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
65440 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J15 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
X45 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 07/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 10/10/1960 |
Service Life |
61 yrs, 3 mths , 10 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1960 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
STR |
Stratford |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
ALLOC |
30E |
Colchester |
w/e |
28/10/1950 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
ALLOC |
30E |
Colchester |
m/e |
31/03/1951 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
3w/e |
28/07/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
10/10/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
20/08/1949 |
Stratford Works |
On 20/8 the Repair Shop contained the following: Nos. 1542, 2501/07/90, 64667/91, 65440, 5551, 8317, 8576, 8654, 9633, 69653, 9685. The last M. & G.N. 'J.93' tank-No. 8489-is in Stratford Yard. Stratford still paints 'British Railways' on tanks and tenders which do not carry the crest. |
SLS/194909 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 640 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7640 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5440 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Colchester (COL) |
|
|
28/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (STR) |
|
|
08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65440 |
|
|
28/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
25/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
24/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
31/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
21/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
28/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
10/10/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65440 |
|
|
11/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|