Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 962 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18765 Week
» 71781 Month
» 191308 Year
» 3218161 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway (1st) |
642 |
m/e |
07/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7642 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5442 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
65442 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J15 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
X45 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 07/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 19/05/1958 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 10 mths , 19 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1959 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
4w/e |
06/09/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
19/05/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
29/06/1958 |
Stratford MPD |
On 29th June, the following were awaiting scrap-62536/80, 62788/97, 65442, 65508/34/5/74, 67195/212/27/30/1, 68490/1/4/5/546/55/68/607/32. In the previous week, 69496, 69609/43 were cut up. |
SLS/195807 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 642 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7642 |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5442 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bury St Edmunds (BSE) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65442 |
|
|
23/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
06/09/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
19/05/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65442 |
|
|
01/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|