Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 324 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14367 Week
» 79321 Month
» 281985 Year
» 3308838 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway (1st) |
643 |
m/e |
07/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7643 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5443 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
65443 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J15 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
X45 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 07/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 07/12/1959 |
Service Life |
60 yrs, 5 mths , 7 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1960 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
ALLOC |
30E |
Colchester |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
07/12/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 643 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7643 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5443 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Colchester (COL) |
|
|
08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65443 |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
15/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
11/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
07/12/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65443 |
|
|
01/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|