Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 2 Online
» 330 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18133 Week
» 71149 Month
» 190676 Year
» 3217529 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway (1st) |
556 |
m/e |
06/1906 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7556 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5454 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
65454 |
m/e |
03/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J15 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
A60 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 06/1906 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 22/05/1959 |
Service Life |
52 yrs, 11 mths , 21 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1959 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
STR |
Stratford |
on |
10/05/1947 |
ALLOC |
30E |
Colchester |
w/e |
02/07/1950 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
w/e |
01/10/1950 |
ALLOC |
32B |
Ipswich |
4w/e |
01/11/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
22/05/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
25/09/1947 |
Stratford Works |
The following withdrawn locos. were noted in the vicinity of the stripping shop on 25/9: 'F3' 7118/21/29/38/45; 'B12/3' 1522; 'D16/3' 2500; 'J15' 5358 an 5403 (all stripped), whilst 7125 an 7148 were intact. Other locos. stripped were: 'J15' 5402/54; 'D16' 2535; 'J17' 5541/71. In the stripping shop were: 'E4' 2784; 'J15' 5472; 'J19/2' 4675 and 'J17' 5549. In the Paint shop were the 'Coffee Pot' 'Y5' 8081 and W.D. 77416. A curious sight was the crane tank shed filled by two W.D.'s 77119 an 77312 (the latter with a 15A shed plate). In the fields behind the New Works were 'F3' 7146; 'J70' 8225; 'H2' 7512; 'D16' 2591; 'B12' 1544 and 'J39' 4841, all awaiting works. W.D. 77476 was in the New Works, and W.D.'s 77302 and 77107 were in the shed yard. 'D16' 2584; 'J20' 4677/93; 'J39' 4708/61, 'J69' 8574/8632; 'F6' 7230 and 'F4' 7162 were all noted newly painted ex-works. 7162 was fitted with a tablet-catcher. |
SLS/194711 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1906 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 556 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7556 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5454 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
02/07/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
01/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
21/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
03/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65454 |
|
|
15/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
22/05/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65454 |
|
|
06/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|