Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1554 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19357 Week
» 72373 Month
» 191900 Year
» 3218753 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway (1st) |
559 |
m/e |
06/1906 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7559 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5457 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
65457 |
m/e |
02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J15 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
A60 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 06/1906 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 11/02/1962 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 8 mths , 11 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1962 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1906 |
CAM |
|
Cambridge |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
11/02/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
11/02/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
05/01/1959 |
Bury St. Edmunds MPD |
From 5th January this shed became a diesel depot for Cambridge diesel cars and a diesel shunter; the last steam engines on shed (4th January) were J20s 64661/6/95, 65457/61; B12s 61573/5 were withdrawn from here on 1st January, 1959. |
SLS/195902 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1906 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 559 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7559 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5457 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65457 |
|
|
11/02/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65457 |
|
|
04/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|