Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 349 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18152 Week
» 71168 Month
» 190695 Year
» 3217548 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway (1st) |
561 |
m/e |
07/1906 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7561 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5459 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
65459 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J15 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
A60 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 07/1906 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 10/02/1960 |
Service Life |
53 yrs, 7 mths , 11 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1960 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1906 |
IPS |
|
Ipswich |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
30A |
|
Stratford |
w/e |
05/12/1959 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
10/02/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
26/12/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
10/02/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1906 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 561 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7561 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5459 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ipswich (IPS) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65459 |
|
|
05/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
10/02/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65459 |
|
|
03/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|