Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 113 Today
» 925 Yesterday
» 1038 Week
» 18374 Month
» 296170 Year
» 1180551 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER (1st) 564 m/e 03/1912
LNER (1924) 7564 y/e 1924
LNER (1946) 5462 m/e 11/1946
BR 65462 m/e 02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class J15
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number B70
Brakes (when built) Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 03/1912
Withdrawal Sun 16/09/1962
Service Life 50 yrs, 6 mths , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
LOW Lowestoft 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 02/07/1960
30A Stratford w/e 14/01/1961
   Withdrawn 16/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1912 To Service To service as GER Number 564
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7564    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5462    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Lowestoft (LOW)    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 65462    
02/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
14/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
16/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 65462    

prev prev