Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 2987 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16393 Week
» 69409 Month
» 188936 Year
» 3215789 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway (1st) |
566 |
m/e |
03/1912 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7566 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5464 |
m/e |
01/1947 |
British Railways |
65464 |
m/e |
06/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J15 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
B70 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 03/1912 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 16/09/1962 |
Service Life |
50 yrs, 6 mths , 18 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1912 |
NOR |
|
Norwich Thorpe |
m/e |
11/1935 |
STR |
|
Stratford |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
16/09/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
16/09/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/11/1946 |
General |
An interesting double-headed train is the 5.30 p.m. Clacton, which daily leaves with any combination of 'D.16/2,' 'D.16/3,' 'B.12/3,' and 'B.17' at the head. Spitalflelds goods has not seen very many strangers, but 3806 (6601) was a change recently. 'F.3' are still seen at Liverpool Street; locos noted being 7139 (8067), 7148 (8047), 7149 (8048), and 8081, all on the Woodford line fairly regularly between the end of June till October. This line also has had 'V.1' 7675 working along it late Sept./Oct., together with various 0-6-0Ts such as 8575, 8612, 8613, and 8633. The Ilford line usually gets the 'J.68' such as 7043 25/9 and 7048 28/8, whilst even the sparse Fenchurch Street service comes in for its share (8538 noted 30/11). The most usual 'J.15' in Liverpool Street are:-7545/6/7/60/5/6, 7641/4/6 and 5453 (7555), and they usually turn up on Brentwood or Gidea Park trains |
SLS/194701 |
28/12/1960 |
Stratford Works (Old Works) |
Old Works: 12110 (30A), 12129 (34G), D2209 (31F), D2219 (32A), D2227 (30A), D2557 (32B), D3301 (30A), D3328 (31B), 65464 (30A), 68633 (for preservation). Diesel Sp.: 12106 (30A), D5030 (30A), D5036 (32B), D5053 (31B), D5067 (31B), D5095 (31B), D5906 (34G), D8202 (32A), D8203 (32A), D8401 (30A). Waiting Wks.: 65446 (30A), 65549 (31B), 65589 (31A). Foundry: 62613. On Shed Ex Wks.: 65361 (30A). Waiting Cutting-up: 65511, 67704/26, 68644. |
SLS/196102 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1912 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 566 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7566 |
|
|
11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
01/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5464 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
06/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65464 |
|
|
16/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65464 |
|
|
05/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|