Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 838 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19749 Week
» 84703 Month
» 287367 Year
» 3314220 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway (1st) |
567 |
m/e |
03/1912 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7567 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5465 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
65465 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J15 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
B70 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 03/1912 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 16/09/1962 |
Service Life |
50 yrs, 6 mths , 18 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1912 |
COL |
|
Colchester |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
30A |
|
Stratford |
w/e |
12/12/1959 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
16/09/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
STR |
Stratford |
on |
30/04/1947 |
ALLOC |
COL |
Colchester |
on |
10/05/1947 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
26/12/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
16/09/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/04/1961 |
Stratford Works (Old Works Yard) |
New Erecting Shop: D204, D5041/3/72/95, D5515/6/62, D5625, D5907, D8216, D8403/8. Outside New Erecting Shop: D206, D5050/1, D5588, D5634, D5905. Old Works: 43105, 64697, 65460/2, 67716, 69646, 69730. Old Works Yard: 65465, 67701, 68538, 69713. Scrap Road: 68578, 69656, Works Shunters : DEPT32/44/5. |
SLS/196106 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1912 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 567 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7567 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5465 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Colchester (COL) |
|
|
08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65465 |
|
|
12/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
16/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65465 |
|
|
01/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|