Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 466 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18269 Week
» 71285 Month
» 190812 Year
» 3217665 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway (1st) |
568 |
m/e |
04/1912 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7568 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5466 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
65466 |
m/e |
10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J15 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
B70 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 04/1912 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 28/07/1958 |
Service Life |
46 yrs, 3 mths , 27 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1959 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
04/1912 |
STR |
|
Stratford |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
30E |
|
Colchester |
4w/e |
25/07/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
28/07/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
STR |
Stratford |
on |
10/05/1947 |
ALLOC |
30E |
Colchester |
4w/e |
11/07/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
28/07/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1912 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 568 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7568 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5466 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65466 |
|
|
25/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
28/07/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65466 |
|
|
04/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|