Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 348 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 3896 Week
» 4786 Month
» 312767 Year
» 1197148 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER (1st) 571 m/e 05/1912
LNER (1924) 7571 y/e 1924
LNER (1946) 5469 m/e 11/1946
BR 65469 w/e 02/12/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class J15
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number B70
Brakes (when built) Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 05/1912
Withdrawal Wed 01/08/1962
Scrapping During 05/1963 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 50 yrs, 3 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
YB Yarmouth Beach 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
32C Lowestoft 5w/e 20/07/1957
32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 21/09/1957
31A Cambridge w/e 16/09/1961
31B March w/e 23/06/1962
   Withdrawn 01/08/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1912 To Service To service as GER Number 571
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7571    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5469    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Yarmouth Beach (YB)    
12/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 65469    
20/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C)    
21/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
16/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
01/08/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 65469    
05/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev