Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1023 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14429 Week
» 67445 Month
» 186972 Year
» 3213825 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1151 |
m/e |
09/1900 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8151 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5501 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
65501 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J16 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
F48 |
To Service |
During 09/1900 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 29/01/1958 |
Service Life |
57 yrs, 4 mths , 29 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
31C |
Kings Lynn |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
4w/e |
18/05/1957 |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
4w/e |
02/11/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
29/01/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1151 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8151 |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5501 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65501 |
|
|
26/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
16/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
18/05/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
19/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
29/01/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65501 |
|
|