Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 127 Today
» 1216 Yesterday
» 4942 Week
» 11076 Month
» 238960 Year
» 1460525 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1153 m/e 09/1900
LNER (1924) 8153 y/e 1924
LNER (1946) 5503 m/e 09/1946
BR 65503 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class J16
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J1609/1900
J1712/1922
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number F48
To Service During 09/1900
Withdrawal Mon 22/08/1960
Service Life 59 yrs, 11 mths , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1900
CAM Cambridge 01/01/1948
31B March 4w/e 19/04/1952
31D South Lynn 5w/e 18/06/1955
31B March 3w/e 12/11/1955
31D South Lynn 4w/e 19/07/1958
31B March 5w/e 15/11/1958
30E Colchester w/e 20/12/1958
30A Stratford w/e 12/12/1959
   Withdrawn 22/08/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 19/04/1952
ALLOC 31D South Lynn 4w/e 18/06/1955
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 05/11/1955
ALLOC 31D South Lynn 4w/e 14/07/1958
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 01/11/1958
ALLOC 30E Colchester 4w/e 27/12/1958
ALLOC BOA   4w/e 26/12/1959
WDN   22/08/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1900 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1153
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8153    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5503    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 65503    
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
18/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to South Lynn (31D)    
12/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
19/07/1958 Allocation Reallocated to South Lynn (31D)    
15/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
20/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
12/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
22/08/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 65503    

prev prev