Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 204 Today
» 1015 Yesterday
» 4372 Week
» 19486 Month
» 322676 Year
» 1544241 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Eastern Railway 1154 m/e 10/1900
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 8154 y/e 1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 5504 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 65504 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class J16
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J1610/1900
J1709/1924
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number F48
To Service During 10/1900
Withdrawal Mon 27/10/1958
Service Life 58 yrs , 27 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1900
SL South Lynn on 01/01/1948
31B March 5w/e 22/09/1951
31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 22/03/1952
31A Cambridge 4w/e 16/05/1953
30A Stratford 4w/e 12/04/1958
   Withdrawn on 27/10/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31B March w/e 15/09/1951
ALLOC 31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 22/03/1952
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 16/05/1953
WDN   w/e 19/10/1953
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 28/03/1958
WDN   on 27/10/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1952 Locomotives still carrying old numbers (LNER) Engines running with L.N.E. Numbers. (March 1952) 1423, 1879, 2364, 2372, 2395, 2620, 2654, 2659, 3573, 3585, 3647, 3913, 4114, 4117, 4140, 4368, 4642, 5177, 5213, 5297, 5331, 5343, 5565, 7461, 7465, 7470, 7471, 7488, 7500, 7604, 7606, 7625, 8000/1, 8091/6, 8103/8/9/10/21/24/30/31/34-38, 8142/3/5/9, 8154/7, 8161/8, 8173/6/7/8, 8249, 8298, 8316, 8343/54, 8405/94, 8504/14/25/68, 8619/64, 8788/95, 8915/74/79, 9143, 9271/73, 9322, 9707. Uncertain: 851, 6480/1, 9290, 9920 (? done and not reported). SLS/195206
21/10/1953 Darlington North Road Works 0-4-0 Diesel No. 11701 (N.B.L. 27101) has been tried on yard shunting and is now in the paint shop. 0-6-0 Diesels Nos. 13067-70 are completed and the next six well advanced. Class 2MT 2-6-0 Nos. 78010/1 are also being built. Sentinel No. 8154 has gone to the scrap yard. It has been announced locally that the passenger service on the Northallerton-Hawes branch is to be withdrawn. SLS/195312

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1900 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1154
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8154    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5504    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - South Lynn (SL)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 65504    
22/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
22/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
16/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
12/04/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
27/10/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 65504    

prev prev