Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 1042 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7431 Week
» 27873 Month
» 364719 Year
» 1586284 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Eastern Railway 1155 m/e 10/1900
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 8155 y/e 1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 5505 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 65505 m/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class J16
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J1610/1900
J1712/1924
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number F48
To Service During 10/1900
Withdrawal Fri 06/11/1959
Service Life 59 yrs, 1 mth , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1900
SL South Lynn on 01/01/1948
31A Cambridge 4w/e 19/05/1951
30A Stratford 4w/e 12/04/1958
30E Colchester w/e 20/12/1958
   Withdrawn on 06/11/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC MAR March w/e 20/08/1949
ALLOC 31A Cambridge w/e 12/05/1951
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 28/03/1958
ALLOC 30E Colchester 4w/e 27/12/1958
WDN   on 06/11/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1948 Darlington Works Locomotives awaiting Works during December included:-Nos. 952, 1437, 1625/41, 2378, 2970 (the last 'C.7'), 3368, 5639, 5650 (badly damaged at Jervaulx), 5693, 5759/97, 5807, 7278, 7651, 8010/37, 8155, 8292, 9792, 9892, 60510, 62732/33, 65056, 67704/05/10/19/23, 69910/33, 'Austerity' 70877, 77414/69. Locomotives ex Works during December included:-Nos. 60918/42/70, 61432, 61601/29/30/51, 62344/65, 62728/31/54, 63352, 63423, 65033, 65856, 67283, 67342, 67636/39/87, 67701, 68016 (altered bunker), 68264/75, 68436, 68696, 68745, 69102, 69794, 69842/79/89, 'Austerity' 77329. Locomotives broken up: Nos. 2390 an 3327. The two Class 'V.2's' which have hitherto been used as main line pilots, have now been replaced by Class 'A.3' Nos. 70 an 76. SLS/194902

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1900 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1155
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8155    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5505    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - South Lynn (SL)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 65505    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
12/04/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
20/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
06/11/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 65505    

prev prev