Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 567 Today
» 852 Yesterday
» 6376 Week
» 13560 Month
» 321541 Year
» 1205922 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1155 m/e 10/1900
LNER (1924) 8155 y/e 1924
LNER (1946) 5505 m/e 10/1946
BR 65505 m/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class J16
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J1610/1900
J1712/1924
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number F48
To Service During 10/1900
Withdrawal Fri 06/11/1959
Service Life 59 yrs, 1 mth , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SL South Lynn 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31A Cambridge 4w/e 19/05/1951
30A Stratford 4w/e 12/04/1958
30E Colchester w/e 20/12/1958
   Withdrawn 06/11/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1900 To Service To service as GER Number 1155
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8155    
12/1924 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5505    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - South Lynn (SL)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 65505    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
12/04/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
20/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
11/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 65505    

prev prev