Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 179 Today
» 911 Yesterday
» 179 Week
» 14083 Month
» 322064 Year
» 1206445 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1156 m/e 10/1900
LNER (1924) 8156 y/e 1924
LNER (1946) 5506 m/e 12/1946
BR 65506 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class J16
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J1610/1900
J1704/1922
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number F48
To Service During 10/1900
Withdrawal Mon 22/08/1960
Service Life 59 yrs, 10 mths , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
CAM Cambridge 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31D South Lynn 4w/e 19/02/1955
31A Cambridge 4w/e 25/05/1956
30A Stratford 4w/e 16/03/1957
30E Colchester w/e 20/12/1958
30A Stratford w/e 12/12/1959
   Withdrawn 22/08/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1900 To Service To service as GER Number 1156
Built at Stratford Works
   
04/1922 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8156    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5506    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65506    
19/02/1955 Allocation Reallocated to South Lynn (31D)    
25/05/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
16/03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
20/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
12/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
08/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 65506    

prev prev