Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 259 Today
» 1015 Yesterday
» 4427 Week
» 19541 Month
» 322731 Year
» 1544296 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Eastern Railway 1157 m/e 10/1900
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 8157 y/e 1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 5507 m/e 12/1946
British Railways 65507 m/e 07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class J16
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J1610/1900
J1702/1923
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number F48
To Service During 10/1900
Withdrawal Sun 10/09/1961
Service Life 60 yrs, 11 mths , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1900
STR Stratford on 01/01/1948
32C Lowestoft 5w/e 23/06/1951
32A Norwich Thorpe 5w/e 22/09/1951
32C Lowestoft 5w/e 17/01/1953
32A Norwich Thorpe 5w/e 23/07/1955
32C Lowestoft 3w/e 12/11/1955
30E Colchester w/e 20/12/1958
30A Stratford w/e 07/11/1959
   Withdrawn on 10/09/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 32C Lowestoft w/e 26/05/1951
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 15/09/1951
WDN   on 08/12/1952
ALLOC 32C Lowestoft 4w/e 24/01/1953
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 16/07/1955
ALLOC 32C Lowestoft 4w/e 05/11/1955
ALLOC 30E Colchester 4w/e 27/12/1958
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 28/11/1959
WDN   on 10/09/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1952 Locomotives still carrying old numbers (LNER) Engines running with L.N.E. Numbers. (March 1952) 1423, 1879, 2364, 2372, 2395, 2620, 2654, 2659, 3573, 3585, 3647, 3913, 4114, 4117, 4140, 4368, 4642, 5177, 5213, 5297, 5331, 5343, 5565, 7461, 7465, 7470, 7471, 7488, 7500, 7604, 7606, 7625, 8000/1, 8091/6, 8103/8/9/10/21/24/30/31/34-38, 8142/3/5/9, 8154/7, 8161/8, 8173/6/7/8, 8249, 8298, 8316, 8343/54, 8405/94, 8504/14/25/68, 8619/64, 8788/95, 8915/74/79, 9143, 9271/73, 9322, 9707. Uncertain: 851, 6480/1, 9290, 9920 (? done and not reported). SLS/195206

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1900 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1157
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8157    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5507    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 65507    
23/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C)    
22/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
17/01/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C)    
23/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
12/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C)    
20/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
10/09/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 65507    

prev prev