Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 4068 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 21871 Week
» 74887 Month
» 194414 Year
» 3221267 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1157 |
m/e |
10/1900 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8157 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5507 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
65507 |
m/e |
07/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J16 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
F48 |
To Service |
During 10/1900 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 10/09/1961 |
Service Life |
60 yrs, 11 mths , 11 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1157 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8157 |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5507 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
01/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
25/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth Beach (YB) |
|
|
26/02/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
07/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65507 |
|
|
26/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) |
|
|
23/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) |
|
|
15/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
22/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
17/01/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) |
|
|
23/07/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
12/11/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) |
|
|
20/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
10/09/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65507 |
|
|