Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 367 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18170 Week
» 71186 Month
» 190713 Year
» 3217566 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1161 |
m/e |
11/1900 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8161 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5511 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
65511 |
m/e |
03/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J16 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
H50 |
To Service |
During 11/1900 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 28/11/1960 |
Service Life |
60 yrs , 28 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1900 |
STR |
|
Stratford |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
30E |
|
Colchester |
w/e |
20/12/1958 |
30A |
|
Stratford |
w/e |
12/12/1959 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
28/11/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
STR |
Stratford |
on |
29/06/1947 |
ALLOC |
30E |
Colchester |
4w/e |
27/12/1958 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
26/12/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
28/11/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/12/1960 |
Stratford Works (Waiting Cutting-up) |
Old Works: 12110 (30A), 12129 (34G), D2209 (31F), D2219 (32A), D2227 (30A), D2557 (32B), D3301 (30A), D3328 (31B), 65464 (30A), 68633 (for preservation). Diesel Sp.: 12106 (30A), D5030 (30A), D5036 (32B), D5053 (31B), D5067 (31B), D5095 (31B), D5906 (34G), D8202 (32A), D8203 (32A), D8401 (30A). Waiting Wks.: 65446 (30A), 65549 (31B), 65589 (31A). Foundry: 62613. On Shed Ex Wks.: 65361 (30A). Waiting Cutting-up: 65511, 67704/26, 68644. |
SLS/196102 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1161 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8161 |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5511 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
03/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65511 |
|
|
20/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
12/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
28/11/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65511 |
|
|