Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 428 Today
» 961 Yesterday
» 5385 Week
» 12569 Month
» 320550 Year
» 1204931 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1164 m/e 12/1900
LNER (1924) 8164 y/e 1924
LNER (1946) 5514 m/e 05/1946
BR 65514 m/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class J16
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J1612/1900
J1704/1923
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number H50
To Service During 12/1900
Withdrawal Mon 04/01/1960
Service Life 59 yrs, 1 mth , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MC Melton Constable 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
32C Lowestoft 4w/e 19/05/1951
32A Norwich Thorpe 5w/e 23/06/1951
32C Lowestoft 5w/e 16/02/1952
32A Norwich Thorpe 5w/e 17/01/1953
32G Melton Constable 3w/e 12/11/1955
30A Stratford 4w/e 16/03/1957
30E Colchester w/e 20/12/1958
30A Stratford w/e 07/11/1959
   Withdrawn 04/01/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1900 To Service To service as GER Number 1164
Built at Stratford Works
   
04/1923 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8164    
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5514    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Melton Constable (MC)    
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 65514    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C)    
23/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
16/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C)    
17/01/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
12/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Melton Constable (32G)    
16/03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
20/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
01/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 65514    

prev prev