Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 4024 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17430 Week
» 70446 Month
» 189973 Year
» 3216826 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1164 |
m/e |
12/1900 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8164 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5514 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
65514 |
m/e |
12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J16 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
H50 |
To Service |
During 12/1900 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 04/01/1960 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 1 mth , 5 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1164 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8164 |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5514 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Melton Constable (MC) |
|
|
26/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65514 |
|
|
05/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) |
|
|
26/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
23/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
16/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) |
|
|
17/01/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
12/11/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Melton Constable (32G) |
|
|
16/03/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
20/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
04/01/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65514 |
|
|