Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2588 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15994 Week
» 69010 Month
» 188537 Year
» 3215390 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1167 |
m/e |
01/1901 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8167 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5517 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
65517 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J16 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
H50 |
To Service |
During 01/1901 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 09/05/1955 |
Service Life |
54 yrs, 4 mths , 8 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
31E |
Bury St Edmunds |
w/e |
13/10/1951 |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
4w/e |
23/02/1952 |
ALLOC |
31D |
South Lynn |
4w/e |
11/07/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
09/05/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1901 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1167 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8167 |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5517 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65517 |
|
|
13/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E) |
|
|
20/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E) |
|
|
16/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
25/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to South Lynn (31D) |
|
|
09/05/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65517 |
|
|