Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 389 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6365 Week
» 12499 Month
» 240383 Year
» 1461948 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1168 m/e 01/1901
LNER (1924) 8168 y/e 1924
LNER (1946) 5518 m/e 10/1946
BR 65518 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class J16
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J1601/1901
J1712/1929
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number H50
To Service During 01/1901
Withdrawal Wed 17/09/1958
Service Life 57 yrs, 8 mths , 17 dys
Information Back Cab Tender fitted specifically for working the Cambridge-Sudbury goods and Kings Lynn-Swaffham-Thetford goods duties where no turntables were available

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1901
MAR March 01/01/1948
30A Stratford 4w/e 20/10/1951
31A Cambridge 4w/e 18/10/1952
31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 16/05/1953
   Withdrawn 17/09/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LOWEng   w/e 07/01/1950
ALLOC 30A Stratford w/e 06/10/1951
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 04/10/1952
ALLOC 31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 16/05/1953
WDN   17/09/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/02/1948 Stratford Works The following locomotives were seen stripped: Nos. *1518, 2620, 4766, 5391, *7118, *7122, *7148, 7203/18, an 9659, while in the process of being stripped were: Nos. 1623/39/52, 5522, an 8529. The following were in course of erection: Nos. 1046/7, 1609/10/21/31/53/59/61/2/3/6 an 8764; No. 4889 was complete, and No. 1553 was apparently in for examination. Awaiting Works at various points were: Nos. 1509/*44/78, 1624, 2536/63, 2590, 2602, 4663/89, *5360/*80/3, 5400/10/18/52, 5506, *7119/*20. *7130/*1/*2/*5/*6/*7/*44/*7/83, 7219/26/37, *7511/*2, 8168/74, 8213, 8372, *8485/*8/9, 8791/6, 8854 an 9604. *Officially withdrawn. The Paint Shop produced the following all newly painted, lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' in yellow paint and prefixed 'E': Nos. 1056, 4687, 5565, an 8376. No. 8082 was stored here. The first locomotive to have been lettered in the above new style was No. 8619, which in addition was painted green and is now to be seen at Liverpool Street, acting as station pilot. The Running Shed produced the following additional locomotives painted in the new style: Nos. 1045, 1664, an 1667 SLS/194803
31/03/1952 Locomotives still carrying old numbers (LNER) Engines running with L.N.E. Numbers. (March 1952) 1423, 1879, 2364, 2372, 2395, 2620, 2654, 2659, 3573, 3585, 3647, 3913, 4114, 4117, 4140, 4368, 4642, 5177, 5213, 5297, 5331, 5343, 5565, 7461, 7465, 7470, 7471, 7488, 7500, 7604, 7606, 7625, 8000/1, 8091/6, 8103/8/9/10/21/24/30/31/34-38, 8142/3/5/9, 8154/7, 8161/8, 8173/6/7/8, 8249, 8298, 8316, 8343/54, 8405/94, 8504/14/25/68, 8619/64, 8788/95, 8915/74/79, 9143, 9271/73, 9322, 9707. Uncertain: 851, 6480/1, 9290, 9920 (? done and not reported). SLS/195206

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1901 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1168
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8168    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5518    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR)    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 65518    
20/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
18/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
16/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
17/09/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 65518    

prev prev