Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 6 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 5350 Week
» 6240 Month
» 314221 Year
» 1198602 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1176 m/e 10/1901
LNER (1924) 8176 y/e 1924
LNER (1946) 5526 m/e 11/1946
BR 65526 m/e 01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class J16
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J1610/1901
J1706/1927
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number L52
To Service During 10/1901
Withdrawal Mon 10/08/1959
Service Life 57 yrs, 10 mths , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SL South Lynn 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31B March 5w/e 22/09/1951
31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 22/03/1952
   Withdrawn 10/08/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1901 To Service To service as GER Number 1176
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8176    
06/1927 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5526    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - South Lynn (SL)    
01/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 65526    
22/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
22/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
08/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 65526    

prev prev