Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 3755 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17161 Week
» 70177 Month
» 189704 Year
» 3216557 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1176 |
m/e |
10/1901 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8176 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5526 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
65526 |
m/e |
01/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J16 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
L52 |
To Service |
During 10/1901 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 10/08/1959 |
Service Life |
57 yrs, 10 mths , 11 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1901 |
SL |
|
South Lynn |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
31B |
|
March |
w/e |
15/09/1951 |
31B |
|
March |
5w/e |
22/09/1951 |
31C |
|
Kings Lynn |
4w/e |
22/03/1952 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
10/08/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
w/e |
15/09/1951 |
ALLOC |
31C |
Kings Lynn |
4w/e |
22/03/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
10/08/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1901 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1176 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8176 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5526 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - South Lynn (SL) |
|
|
01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65526 |
|
|
15/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
22/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
22/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
10/08/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65526 |
|
|