Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 126 Today
» 1216 Yesterday
» 4941 Week
» 11075 Month
» 238959 Year
» 1460524 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1180 m/e 11/1901
LNER (1924) 8180 y/e 1924
LNER (1946) 5530 m/e 06/1946
BR 65530 m/e 11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class J16
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J1611/1901
J1708/1929
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number P52
To Service During 11/1901
Withdrawal Mon 11/01/1960
Service Life 58 yrs, 2 mths , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1901
KL Kings Lynn 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn 11/01/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DAR Darlington 23/02/1947
ALLOC GHD Gateshead 17/03/1947
WDN   11/01/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1949 Darlington Works Locomotives awaiting Works during March included: Nos. 1173, 1240, 2343, 2703, 3005/44, 3139, 3273, 5028/36, 5091, 5668, 5715, 5821, 8180, 8705, 9107, 9374/75, 9880, 61023, 61434, 61619/43, 62730/52, 63099, 63315/80, 65119, 67709/22 (both light repairs), 69807/65, Class '8' 77499, 78578/85, 79206. To scrap yard: Nos, 3332, 5649/68, 5715, 9374. Locomotives ex Works during March included: Nos. 5629/33 (both fitted small snow ploughs at Gateshead Works), 60816, 61020 (name removed), 61216, 61422, 61618, 61644 (rebuilt 2 cyls.), 61645/47/48, 62700/21/64, 63392, 63411/17/30/65, 65094, 65656, 65800/76, 67244/68, 67344, 67615, 68265, 68409/25/32, 68708/13, 69401, 69773, W.D. 90008 (light repair), 90103, 90235, 90391, 90606. No. 5626 has been sold out of service to the Bolton Colliery, it is understood. Easingwold Rly. 0-6-OT No. 2 has been broken up in the scrap yard here by a private firm. SLS/194905

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1901 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1180
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8180    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5530    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kings Lynn (KL)    
11/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 65530    
11/01/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 65530    

prev prev