Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 2087 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 25718 Week
» 90672 Month
» 293336 Year
» 3320189 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1182 |
m/e |
11/1901 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8182 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5532 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
65532 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J16 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
P52 |
To Service |
During 11/1901 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 11/02/1962 |
Service Life |
60 yrs, 3 mths , 11 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
CAM |
Cambridge |
w/e |
06/03/1948 |
ALLOC |
31E |
Bury St Edmunds |
4w/e |
18/09/1954 |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
4w/e |
29/01/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
11/02/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1901 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1182 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8182 |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5532 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - South Lynn (SL) |
|
|
06/03/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65532 |
|
|
23/10/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E) |
|
|
19/02/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
11/02/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65532 |
|
|