Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 475 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19386 Week
» 84340 Month
» 287004 Year
» 3313857 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1185 |
m/e |
12/1901 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8185 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5535 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
65535 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J16 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
P52 |
To Service |
During 12/1901 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 05/05/1958 |
Service Life |
56 yrs, 5 mths , 5 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1901 |
CAM |
|
Cambridge |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
30A |
|
Stratford |
4w/e |
19/02/1955 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
05/05/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
26/02/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
05/05/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
12/08/1957 |
Bishops Stortford |
No transfers are recorded between Stratford and this shed (30C), its allocation at present being 65535/6, 67701/11/3/21/2/3, 69676, 69713. N7 69676 replaced 67738 which went to Lowestoft. |
SLS/195709 |
29/06/1958 |
Stratford MPD |
On 29th June, the following were awaiting scrap-62536/80, 62788/97, 65442, 65508/34/5/74, 67195/212/27/30/1, 68490/1/4/5/546/55/68/607/32. In the previous week, 69496, 69609/43 were cut up. |
SLS/195807 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1901 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1185 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8185 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5535 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65535 |
|
|
19/02/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
05/05/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65535 |
|
|