Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 387 Today
» 1251 Yesterday
» 4125 Week
» 1638 Month
» 229522 Year
» 1451087 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1186 m/e 12/1901
LNER (1924) 8186 y/e 1924
LNER (1946) 5536 m/e 11/1946
BR 65536 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class J16
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J1612/1901
J1708/1929
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number P52
To Service During 12/1901
Withdrawal Thu 17/03/1960
Service Life 58 yrs, 3 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1901
STR Stratford 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn 17/03/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   11/02/1952
WDN   17/03/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/08/1957 Bishops Stortford No transfers are recorded between Stratford and this shed (30C), its allocation at present being 65535/6, 67701/11/3/21/2/3, 69676, 69713. N7 69676 replaced 67738 which went to Lowestoft. SLS/195709

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1901 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1186
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8186    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5536    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 65536    
17/03/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 65536    

prev prev