Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 185 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 1284 Week
» 7418 Month
» 235302 Year
» 1456867 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GER 1191 m/e 09/1902
LNER (1924) 8191 y/e 1924
LNER (1946) 5541 m/e 10/1946
BR 65541 m/e 08/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class J16
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J1609/1902
J1711/1930
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number B54
To Service During 09/1902
Withdrawal Sun 16/09/1962
Service Life 60 yrs , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1902
STR Stratford 01/01/1948
32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 15/11/1952
30A Stratford 5w/e 17/01/1953
31B March 4w/e 21/11/1953
31A Cambridge 5w/e 23/04/1955
31B March w/e 12/11/1960
   Withdrawn 16/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 29/11/1952
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 27/12/1952
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 28/11/1953
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 23/04/1955
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 26/11/1960
WDN   16/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1902 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1191
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 8191    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 5541    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
08/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 65541    
15/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
17/01/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
21/11/1953 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
23/04/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
12/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
16/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 65541    

prev prev